CA SB376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 11108.2, 16520, 16730, 25555, 26379, 26384, 26405, 26515, 26540, 26805, 26890, 27905, 27966, 28230, and 29010 of, to add Sections 26556, 26576, 26577, 26581, and 27937 to, to repeal Sections 26955 and 27655 of, and to repeal and add Sections 27820 and 27900 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB376 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 376 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB376 Portantino (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 376 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB376 Portantino (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2843.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3267.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1251.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1098.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 526.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11108.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26379 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26384 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26556 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26576 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26577 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26581 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 26805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26955 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27655 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27937 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |