CA SB393 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 668.5 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to vessels.
Title
Vessels: impoundment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB393 Stone Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 393 Stone Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB393 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 393 Stone Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB393 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2907.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 668.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |