CA SB394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9E (commencing with Section 1001.83) to Title 6 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: diversion for primary caregivers of minor children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB394 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 394 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB394 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 394 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB394 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2890.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 14. Page 3433.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 916.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.83 | New Code | See Bill Text |