CA SB399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13500 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB399 Atkins Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 399 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 399 Atkins Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB399 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 399 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 399 Atkins Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB399 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3345.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 823.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |