CA SB402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38026.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: off-highway vehicle recreation: County of Inyo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 402 Borgeas Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB402 Borgeas (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB402 Borgeas (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 2756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and W., P., & W. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1159.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 777.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 656.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and N.R. & W. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38026.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |