CA SB409 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 374.3 of the Penal Code, relating to illegal dumping.
Title
Illegal dumping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB409 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB409 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 374.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |