CA SB41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3361 to the Civil Code, relating to damages.
Title
Civil actions: damages.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent SB41 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 41 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB41 Hertzberg et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - SB 41 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB41 Hertzberg et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2055.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3361 | New Code | See Bill Text |