CA SB415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12804.9 of, and to add Section 501 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: trailers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-17SenateApril 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code12804.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code501New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code5370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback