CA SB417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the California Victim Compensation Board, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Victim Compensation Board: claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB417 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - SB 417 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Gonzalez (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB417 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - SB 417 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Gonzalez (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB417 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 3896.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4889.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (January 21). |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |