CA SB42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 4024 of, and to add Section 4024.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to jails.
Title
The Getting Home Safe Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB42 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 42 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Eggman (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Skinner (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 42 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Eggman (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Skinner (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4024 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4024.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |