CA SB421 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 96050) of Title 15 of the Government Code, relating to children’s services.
Title
Children’s Cabinet of California.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and G.O. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 96050 | New Code | See Bill Text |