CA SB424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 8.55 (commencing with Section 22965) to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 20.5 (commencing with Section 42984) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to tobacco products.
Title
Tobacco products: single-use and multiuse components.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB424 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 715.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH, EQ., and JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22965 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42984 | New Code | See Bill Text |