CA SB445 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 11759) of Part 1 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Alcohol and drug treatment: youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB445 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 445 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB445 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 445 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB445 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2868.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3319.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11759 | New Code | See Bill Text |