CA SB449 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6046, 6047.19, 6047.20, 6047.21, 6047.27, and 6047.29 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pest control, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Pest control: Pierce’s disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB449 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 449 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB449 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 449 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB449 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3046.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 22). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 6046 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6047.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6047.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6047.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6047.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 6047.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |