CA SB453 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9120 and 9121 of, and to add Sections 9122 and 9123 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to older adults.
Title
Older adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB453 Hurtado et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 453 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB453 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 453 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB453 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3182.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | June 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9123 | New Code | See Bill Text |