CA SB468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 42 and 43 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: tax expenditures: California Tax Expenditure Review Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB468 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 468 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB468 Jackson (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 468 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB468 Jackson (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-11 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-11 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3313.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1322.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1100.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 903.) (May 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |