CA SB480 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13655 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement uniforms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement uniforms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB480 Archuleta Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 480 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Jones-Sawyer (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB480 Archuleta (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 13.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (August 18).
2020-08-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 5).
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3131.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (January 21).
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3079.) (January 13).
2020-01-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 13.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13655New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback