CA SB482 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22329 and 22337 of, and to add Section 22320.3 to, the Financial Code, relating to lending.
Title
Consumer loans: restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 712.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22320.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22329 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |