CA SB485 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 494.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 13202.4, 13202.5, and 13202.6 of, to add Section 13107 to, and to repeal Section 13201.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to driving privilege.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving privilege: suspension or delay.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Beall et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-09AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1100.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 526.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback