CA SB486 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11831.6 and 11831.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to recovery residences.
Title
Recovery residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2020-01-15 | Senate | January 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3100.) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11831.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |