CA SB50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 15. Page 3176.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65589.5 of, to add Sections 65913.5 and 65913.6 to, and to add Chapter 4.35 (commencing with Section 65918.50) to Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: housing development: streamlined approval: incentives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB50 Wiener et al (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB50 Wiener et al. Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB50 Wiener et al (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 15. Page 3176.)
2020-01-29SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3170.)
2020-01-29SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Wiener.
2020-01-29SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 15. Page 3169.)
2020-01-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-27SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-01-27SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3146.)
2020-01-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 845.) (April 24).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 551.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65589.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65913.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65913.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback