CA SB523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2194 and 3019 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB523 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 523 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB523 McGuire (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 523 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB523 McGuire (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 568, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3434.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1212.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2194 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |