CA SB527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51201 and 51231 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: Williamson Act: cultivation of cannabis and hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB527 Caballero Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 527 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB527 Caballero (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 527 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB527 Caballero (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 273, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2265.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 10. Page 2672.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 713.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |