CA SB538 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 119407 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to electronic cigarettes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Electronic cigarettes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB538 Rubio et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 538 Rubio Third Reading Urgency By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB538 Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 538 Rubio Third Reading Urgency By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB538 Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | August 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 119407 | New Code | See Bill Text |