CA SB54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23671 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 42040) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 48710) of Part 7 of Division 30 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: packaging and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-01 - Assembly - SB 54 Allen Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - SB 54 Allen Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez Amendment Set #1 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Allen et al (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - SB 54 Allen Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez Amendment Set #1 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Allen et al (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Assembly | Died on call pursuant to Article IV, Section 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 18. Page 5524.) |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gonzalez. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 38. Noes 16. Page 3076.) |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 3066.) |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 8). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | May 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 48710 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |