CA SB540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 250, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 250, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5236 of the Corporations Code, relating to nonprofit corporations.
Title
Nonprofit public benefit corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 540 Jones Senate Third Reading By Cooley (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Jones (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB540 Jones (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 250, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 2803.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | June 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and INS. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 24). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 10). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and B. & F.I. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5236 | Amended Code | Citation Text |