CA SB558 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 99524 of, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 99530) to Title 20 of, the Government Code, and to amend and renumber Section 475 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to California-Mexico affairs.
Title
Commission on California-Mexico Affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB558 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 558 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB558 Hueso et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 558 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB558 Hueso et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1213.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 99524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 99530 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 475 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |