CA SB57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2263 and 2265 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
California New Motor Voter Program: voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2020-01-07 | Senate | January 7 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3055.) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 7. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | April 23 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and TRANS. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |