CA SB574 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84810.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: inmate education programs:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-28 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 496.) | |
2009-03-26 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |