CA SB574 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25299.57 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to underground storage tanks.
Title
Underground storage tanks: corrective action.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25299.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |