CA SB574 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 92680) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
University of California: alternative investment information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB574 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB574 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1207.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in ED. pending receipt. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 92032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92680 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6254.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |