CA SB574 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 111792.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to cosmetics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetic Fragrance and Flavor Ingredient Right to Know Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB574 Leyva (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 844.) (April 24).
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 715.) (April 10).
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-21SenateApril 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code111792.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback