CA SB601 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11009.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State agencies: licenses: fee waiver.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB601 Morrell et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 601 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 601 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2910.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11009.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |