CA SB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 737, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 737, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27510, 27540, and 27590 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 26835 and 27535 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: transfers.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB61 Portantino (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 61 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Portantino et al (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 61 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Portantino et al (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 737, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2938.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 3537.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1089.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 525.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |