CA SB611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 9150) to Chapter 2 of Division 8.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing: elderly and individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB611 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 611 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB611 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 611 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB611 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3048.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9150 | New Code | See Bill Text |