CA SB613 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 1008, 4118, and 4458 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to immigration status.
Title
Immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 613 De León Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB613 De León (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB613 De León (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3492.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 18). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1312.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 855.) (April 25). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1008 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4118 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4458 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |