CA SB621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-08 - July 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-08 - July 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 21168.10, 21176, and 21176.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: expedited judicial review: affordable housing projects: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB621 Glazer et al (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 799.) (April 23). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 652.) (April 10). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21176 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21176.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |