CA SB630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 52.6 of the Civil Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 630 Stern Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB630 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB630 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 846.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 52.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |