CA SB636 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - July 3 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 303, 9050, 9051, 9053, and 13282 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: ballot label.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB636 Stern (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03AssemblyJuly 3 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1106.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback