CA SB644 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1950.5 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenancy: security deposit: service members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB644 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 644 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB644 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 644 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB644 Glazer et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2884.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3318.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 23). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1950.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |