CA SB652 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1940.45 and 4706 to the Civil Code, relating to housing.
Title
Entry doors: display of religious items: prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 652 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB652 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB652 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2574.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 964.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 891.) (April 30). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HOUSING. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1940.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 4706 | New Code | See Bill Text |