CA SB659 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21175 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: attorney’s fees: infill housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 907.) (April 30). |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 844.) (April 24). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21175 | New Code | See Bill Text |