CA SB662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 43869 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 237.5, 400.3, 740.3, 740.8, and 740.12 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: transportation sector: hydrogen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB662 Archuleta et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and TRANS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1106.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 806.) (April 23). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 651.) (April 10). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43869 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 237.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 400.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |