CA SB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26063 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Cannabis: marketing: appellations of origin: county, city, or city and county of origin.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB67 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 67 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB67 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 67 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By Wood (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB67 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5295.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Wood. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 561.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 263.) (February 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Set for hearing February 27. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8. |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26063 | Amended Code | Citation Text |