CA SB680 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1747.81, 1785.14, and 1798.92 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 1355 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 180 of the Family Code, to amend Section 964 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 219.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to names.
Title
Names.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB680 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB680 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 4). |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1747.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1785.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 964 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 219.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |