CA SB681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 9144.5, 9237.2, 9266.5, and 9341.5 to the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Local referenda and charter amendments: withdrawal.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB681 Stern Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 681 Stern Third Reading Urgency By Calderon (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 681 Stern Third Reading Urgency By Calderon (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9144.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9237.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9266.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 9341.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |