CA SB684 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-29 - From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-29 - From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9604 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Initiative measures: withdrawal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 684 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB684 Umberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB684 Umberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) |
2020-08-30 | Senate | August 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5062.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 27). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3055.) (January 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Set for hearing January 7 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |