CA SB687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8257 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homeless Coordinating and Financing Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB687 Rubio Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 687 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Assembly - Result (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB687 Rubio (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 687 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Assembly - Result (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB687 Rubio (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2885.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2874.) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Set for hearing September 11. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2733.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3206.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 4). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1107.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |