CA SB69 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6922 of, to add Sections 1618 and 6921.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 1127 of, the Fish and Game Code, to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 39950) to Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10001, 10004, and 10005 of, and to add Sections 4557, 4563, 5814.5, and 5818.3 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ocean Resiliency Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB69 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 8).
2019-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 2).
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-06-13AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 1285.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1089.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 843.) (April 24).
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 9).
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
2019-03-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1127Repealed CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code1618New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code6921.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code6922Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39950New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code10001Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code10004Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code10005Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code36002Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4557New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4563New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5814.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5818.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback