CA SB697 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3500, 3501, 3502, 3502.1, 3502.3, 3509, 3516, 3518, 3527, and 3528 of, and to repeal Sections 3516.5, 3521, and 3522 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physician assistants: practice agreement: supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB697 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 697 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB697 Caballero et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 697 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB697 Caballero et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3183.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1107.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3502.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3502.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3516 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3516.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3518 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3521 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3522 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3527 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3528 | Amended Code | Citation Text |